Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0734 (SB0224)
Title
Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510
Title
Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0809)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658)
Title
Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1188)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0183 /CH0658 (SB0449) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0222 /CH0734 (SB0224) Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB0510 Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1188 (SB0809) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0449 (HB0183/CH0658) Public Information Act – Revisions (Equitable Access to Records Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0809 (HB1188) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page