Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Occupational Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0998 County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page