Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Obscenity -see also- Nudity & Sexual Displays; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0393
Title
Juveniles - Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 (SB0134)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB0263)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0331
Title
Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0393 Juveniles - Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 (SB0134) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1314 Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
SB0134 (HB0263) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0331 Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page