Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Oaths

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 /CH0440 (SB0097/CH0441)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0441 (HB0205/CH0440)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714)
Title
State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0205 /CH0440 (SB0097/CH0441) Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0329 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 /CH0714 (SB0317/CH0715) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0097 /CH0441 (HB0205/CH0440) Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0715 (HB0663/CH0714) State Government – Notarial Acts – Fees and Use of Communication Technology Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0352 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page