Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 (SB0028/CH0738)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 (SB0085)
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0003/CH0513)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0627
Title
Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs and the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy - Membership, Staffing, and Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0625)
Title
Transportation of Disabled Persons - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 /CH0195 (SB0975/CH0196)
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0680)
Title
State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0513 (HB0297)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0738 (HB0080)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 (HB0103)
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0533
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0726)
Title
Transportation of Persons With Disabilities - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements and Study
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB1332)
Title
State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Employed Individuals With Disabilities Program - Requirements (Equal Love for Employees With Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0196 (HB0809/CH0195)
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 (SB0028/CH0738) Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0103 (SB0085) Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0003/CH0513) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0662 /CH0627 Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs and the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy - Membership, Staffing, and Appointment Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 (SB0625) Transportation of Disabled Persons - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 /CH0195 (SB0975/CH0196) Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 (SB0680) State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0003 /CH0513 (HB0297) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0028 /CH0738 (HB0080) Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Finance
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0085 (HB0103) Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 /CH0533 Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0726) Transportation of Persons With Disabilities - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements and Study Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 (HB1332) State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Employed Individuals With Disabilities Program - Requirements (Equal Love for Employees With Disabilities Act) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 /CH0196 (HB0809/CH0195) Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page