Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Disabled (O3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0389
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 /CH0700 (SB0958/CH0701)
Title
Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 /CH0260
Title
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 /CH0701 (HB1365/CH0700)
Title
Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0392 Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0718 /CH0389 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1365 /CH0700 (SB0958/CH0701) Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Appropriations
3/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0610 /CH0260 Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0958 /CH0701 (HB1365/CH0700) Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2021 - 10:30 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:22 AM
Click to return on the top page