Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0258 (SB0076/CH0257)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0223)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0631)
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0722)
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - Minimum Benefit
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0785 (SB0613/CH0786)
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 /CH0341 (SB0875/CH0340)
Title
Miriam Kelty Aging and Senior Social Connection Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wolek
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0257 (HB0068/CH0258)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0161
Title
Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0255)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 /CH0786 (HB0874/CH0785)
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 (HB0349)
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB0543)
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0340 (HB1103/CH0341)
Title
Miriam Kelty Aging and Senior Social Connection Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 /CH0258 (SB0076/CH0257) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0194 Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0255 (SB0223) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0349 (SB0631) Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0543 (SB0722) Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - Minimum Benefit Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0874 /CH0785 (SB0613/CH0786) State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1103 /CH0341 (SB0875/CH0340) Miriam Kelty Aging and Senior Social Connection Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Delegate Wolek 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1177 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Subscriber Rights and Provider Duties Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 /CH0257 (HB0068/CH0258) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Transparency, Grievances, and Unit Reoccupancy Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0202 /CH0161 Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0223 (HB0255) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0613 /CH0786 (HB0874/CH0785) State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 (HB0349) Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0722 (HB0543) Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - State Supplement Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0340 (HB1103/CH0341) Miriam Kelty Aging and Senior Social Connection Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page