Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207
Title
Nursing Homes – Resident Change in Condition – Notification and Consultation With Physician
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276
Title
Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 /CH0160 (SB0704/CH0159)
Title
Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0789
Title
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 /CH0790 (SB0748/CH0791)
Title
Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Clinical Information
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 (HB0806)
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 /CH0159 (HB0674/CH0160)
Title
Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 /CH0791 (HB1022/CH0790)
Title
Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Clinical Information
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Membership and Cochairs
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0207 Nursing Homes – Resident Change in Condition – Notification and Consultation With Physician Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2021 - 3:45 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0674 /CH0160 (SB0704/CH0159) Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0962 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0983 /CH0789 Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act) Delegate Lehman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 /CH0790 (SB0748/CH0791) Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Clinical Information Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1167 Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1292 Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0047 (HB0806) Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 /CH0159 (HB0674/CH0160) Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Surveys Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0748 /CH0791 (HB1022/CH0790) Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Clinical Information Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0795 Oversight Committee on Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Membership and Cochairs Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page