Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Nursing Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0753 (SB0476/CH0754)
Title
Health Occupations – Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0013/CH0161)
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 /CH0161 (HB1193)
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0699
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 /CH0754 (HB0095/CH0753)
Title
Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 /CH0465
Title
State Board of Nursing - Certified Nursing Assistant Advisory Committee - Membership and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 /CH0753 (SB0476/CH0754) Health Occupations – Nurses – Delegation of Tasks Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1193 (SB0013/CH0161) Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0013 /CH0161 (HB1193) Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0307 /CH0699 Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0476 /CH0754 (HB0095/CH0753) Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0744 /CH0465 State Board of Nursing - Certified Nursing Assistant Advisory Committee - Membership and Meetings Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 465
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page