Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nurse Practitioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0262 (SB0380/CH0263)
Title
Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678)
Title
Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0305)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 /CH0675
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0843)
Title
Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0260)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 /CH0263 (HB0049/CH0262)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program - Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0372
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB1335)
Title
Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 /CH0262 (SB0380/CH0263) Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners Delegate Johnson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2022 - 2:50 PM
Finance
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678) Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0260 (SB0305) State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0676 Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 /CH0675 Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1335 (SB0843) Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Rules
SB0305 (HB0260) State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677) Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0380 /CH0263 (HB0049/CH0262) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program - Nurse Practitioners Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0661 /CH0372 Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0843 (HB1335) Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:21 PM
Click to return on the top page