Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402
Title
Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 (SB0383)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910 (SB0837)
Title
Deep Creek Lake - Lower Lake Levels - Requirement and Impact Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hinebaugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0680 (SB0854/CH0681)
Title
Agriculture – Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 (SB0785)
Title
Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0936)
Title
Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0417)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714)
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1126)
Title
Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0910)
Title
Deep Creek Lake - Lower Lake Levels - Requirement and Impact Study
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0681 (HB0929/CH0680)
Title
Agriculture – Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 (HB1250)
Title
Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0402 Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0417 (SB0383) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0910 (SB0837) Deep Creek Lake - Lower Lake Levels - Requirement and Impact Study Delegate Hinebaugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0680 (SB0854/CH0681) Agriculture – Nuisance Insects Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0947 /CH0714 (SB0488) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Delegate Phillips 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1126 (SB0785) Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1250 (SB0936) Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0383 (HB0417) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 (HB0947/CH0714) Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0785 (HB1126) Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB0910) Deep Creek Lake - Lower Lake Levels - Requirement and Impact Study Senator McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 /CH0681 (HB0929/CH0680) Agriculture – Nuisance Insects Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 (HB1250) Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB1159 Criminal Law - Unruly Social Events - Prohibition Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page