Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0858 (SB0130/CH0859)
Title
Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Public Schools - Sexually Explicit Materials - Prohibited in Libraries and Media Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671 (SB0355)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 (SB0382)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0780)
Title
Internet–Connected Devices and Internet Service Providers – Default Filtering of Obscene Content (Maryland Online Child Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0859 (HB0005/CH0858)
Title
Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0671)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0672)
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH1044
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 (HB0772)
Title
Internet-Connected Devices and Internet Service Providers - Default Filtering of Obscene Content (Maryland Online Child Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0858 (SB0130/CH0859) Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor Delegate Crosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 858
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0025 Public Schools - Sexually Explicit Materials - Prohibited in Libraries and Media Centers Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 (SB0355) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 (SB0382) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0780) Internet–Connected Devices and Internet Service Providers – Default Filtering of Obscene Content (Maryland Online Child Protection Act) Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1311 Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0859 (HB0005/CH0858) Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 859
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0355 (HB0671) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Material to Minors - Prohibition Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 10:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
SB0382 (HB0672) Criminal Law - Display of Obscene Materials to Minors - Age Verification Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 /CH1044 Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024 Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1044
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0780 (HB0772) Internet-Connected Devices and Internet Service Providers - Default Filtering of Obscene Content (Maryland Online Child Protection Act) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page