Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034
Title
Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 (SB0222/CH0036)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0959)
Title
Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0162)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB1410)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0036 (HB0372)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0471)
Title
Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure Within the Sight of a Minor Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0194 Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Sexting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 (SB0222/CH0036) Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0471 (SB0959) Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1410 (SB0162) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0162 (HB1410) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 /CH0036 (HB0372) Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0959 (HB0471) Criminal Law – Indecent Exposure With Lascivious or Prurient Intent Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page