Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 /CH0598
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0914)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 (SB0815)
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 /CH0043
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB1375)
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB0967)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0526 /CH0598 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0967 (SB0914) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 (SB0815) Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages (Buddy's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 /CH0043 Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Inspector General Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0815 (HB1375) Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0914 (HB0967) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page