Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Registration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 /CH0468
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0387 (SB0080/CH0388)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0549
Title
Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 /CH0434
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electronic or Digital 24-Hour Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383
Title
Vehicle Laws - Military Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0388 (HB0193/CH0387)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266
Title
Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703
Title
Frederick County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Vehicle Laws - Surrender of Registration Card and Registration Plates - Refund of Registration Fee
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 /CH0468 Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0193 /CH0387 (SB0080/CH0388) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0368 /CH0549 Vehicle Laws - Penalties for Lapse of Security - Grace Period Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 /CH0434 Vehicle Laws - Electronic or Digital 24-Hour Registration Delegate Wivell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1314 Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 Vehicle Laws - Military Vehicles - Registration and Operation Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts and Low Speed Vehicles - Cobb Island Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0388 (HB0193/CH0387) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 Department of Transportation – Vehicle Litter Reporting Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0670 Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 Frederick County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts Frederick County Senators 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 Vehicle Laws - Surrender of Registration Card and Registration Plates - Refund of Registration Fee Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:09 PM
Click to return on the top page