Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0602 (SB0149/CH0601)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal - Insurer of Record - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 /CH0073 (SB0254/CH0074)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Insurance Companies - Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0902)
Title
Wildlife - Protections and Highway Crossings
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387 (SB0172)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increases - Collisions With Wild Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autonomous Vehicles - Standards, Requirements, and Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 /CH0857
Title
Uninsured Driving Penalties - Funding for the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund, Driver Education, and Transportation to Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483
Title
Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0601 (HB0176/CH0602)
Title
Vehicle Towing or Removal – Insurer of Record – Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB1387)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increases - Collisions With Wild Animals
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 /CH0074 (HB0229/CH0073)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Insurance Companies - Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1129)
Title
Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0176 /CH0602 (SB0149/CH0601) Vehicle Towing or Removal - Insurer of Record - Electronic Notification Delegate Foley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0229 /CH0073 (SB0254/CH0074) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Insurance Companies - Requirements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1129 (SB0902) Wildlife - Protections and Highway Crossings Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1387 (SB0172) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increases - Collisions With Wild Animals Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 Motor Vehicles - Autonomous Vehicles - Standards, Requirements, and Prohibited Acts Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 /CH0857 Uninsured Driving Penalties - Funding for the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund, Driver Education, and Transportation to Field Trips Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 857
Economic Matters
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1483 Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Assessments Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 /CH0601 (HB0176/CH0602) Vehicle Towing or Removal – Insurer of Record – Electronic Notification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 (HB1387) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Premium Increases - Collisions With Wild Animals Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0254 /CH0074 (HB0229/CH0073) Vehicle Laws - Motor Vehicle Insurance Companies - Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0902 (HB1129) Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page