Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0552)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 /CH0103
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373
Title
Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0168)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1251)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 (SB0552) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0221 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0726) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0699 Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1251 (SB0805) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1275 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0110 /CH0103 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0373 Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0168) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0805 (HB1251) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page