Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 (SB0681)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1315)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0250 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 (SB0681) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0586 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB1315) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:17 PM
Click to return on the top page