Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0615)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0573
Title
Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931 (SB0886)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0274)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB0931)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 (SB0615) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0679 /CH0573 Vehicle Laws – Licensing of Businesses and Occupations – Definition of Vehicle Salesman Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0931 (SB0886) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0274) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Prices Listed on Dealer Website Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0886 (HB0931) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Incentives Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page