Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Repair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926 /CH0586 (SB0697/CH0587)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 (SB0922)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0428)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB1460)
Title
Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0587 (HB0926/CH0586)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1079)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0926 /CH0586 (SB0697/CH0587) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1079 (SB0922) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Motor Vehicles - Modified Vehicle Exhaust System - Penalties Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB0428) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0428 (HB1460) Consumer Protection - Automotive Glass Repair or Replacement - Advanced Driver Assistance System Recalibration Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0587 (HB0926/CH0586) Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0922 (HB1079) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Standards, Requirements, and Application Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page