Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0748
Title
Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 /CH0116
Title
Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 /CH0323
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Digital Animation Projects
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0748 Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Alterations Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 /CH0116 Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0536 /CH0323 Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Digital Animation Projects Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:29 PM
Click to return on the top page