Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Monuments and Memorials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0443)
Title
Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0438)
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0438 (SB0443) Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1099 Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0443 (HB0438) Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page