Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Residential Rental Properties and Mobile Home Parks - Security Deposits - Rate of Interest
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 /CH0250
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 Residential Rental Properties and Mobile Home Parks - Security Deposits - Rate of Interest Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 /CH0250 Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page