Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Midwives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Direct-Entry Midwives - Previous Cesarean Section
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678)
Title
Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Health Occupations - Licensed Direct-Entry Midwives - Previous Cesarean Section Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678) Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677) Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page