Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mentors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0677
Title
Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 /CH0308 (SB0511/CH0307)
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Report on Apprenticeship Mentoring Ratios
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 /CH0937 (SB1036/CH0936)
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141 (SB1068/CH0450)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0228 (SB0937/CH0227)
Title
Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Teachers - Retention and Support Policies, Guidelines, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1441 /CH0165
Title
Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490 (SB0765)
Title
Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0307 (HB0650/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Report on Apprenticeship Mentoring Ratios
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 (HB1490)
Title
Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 /CH0227 (HB1157/CH0228)
Title
Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 /CH0936 (HB1037/CH0937)
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0450 (HB1141)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0677 Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 /CH0308 (SB0511/CH0307) Maryland Department of Labor - Report on Apprenticeship Mentoring Ratios Delegate Boafo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1037 /CH0937 (SB1036/CH0936) Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment Delegate Taylor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 937
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1141 (SB1068/CH0450) Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1157 /CH0228 (SB0937/CH0227) Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Judicial Proceedings
HB1326 Primary and Secondary Education - Teachers - Retention and Support Policies, Guidelines, and Training Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1441 /CH0165 Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1490 (SB0765) Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0307 (HB0650/CH0308) Maryland Department of Labor - Report on Apprenticeship Mentoring Ratios Senator Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0765 (HB1490) Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0937 /CH0227 (HB1157/CH0228) Grow Your Own Educators Grant Program - Established Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB1036 /CH0936 (HB1037/CH0937) Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 936
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1068 /CH0450 (HB1141) Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page