Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mentors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513 /CH0494
Title
Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752
Title
Public Schools - School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 /CH0675
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485)
Title
Maryland New Start Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0513 /CH0494 Infant and Early Childhood Mental Health Support Services Program - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0752 Public Schools - School Psychologist Recruitment Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 /CH0675 Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0554 (HB0158/CH0485) Maryland New Start Act of 2022 Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:20 PM
Click to return on the top page