Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0398 (SB0027/CH0397)
Title
Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia – Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 (SB0513)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0253
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766)
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941
Title
Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Studies of Issues Affecting Individuals With Sickle Cell Disease
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0590)
Title
Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0397 (HB0166/CH0398)
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0254
Title
Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0224
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0276)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1392)
Title
Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0398 (SB0027/CH0397) Alzheimer’s Disease and Dementia – Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2022 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0276 (SB0513) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0775 /CH0253 Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766) Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0941 Income Tax Checkoff – Lions Vision Research Foundation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Public Funds - Prohibition on Expenditures for Abortion (Abortion Subsidy Prohibition Act) Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 Maryland Health Care Commission - Studies of Issues Affecting Individuals With Sickle Cell Disease Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0590) Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Rules
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 /CH0397 (HB0166/CH0398) Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0051 /CH0254 Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund - Establishment Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0200 /CH0224 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0513 (HB0276) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0590 (HB1392) Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2022 - 12:00 PM
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page