Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Examiners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0829
Title
Death Certificates - Cause or Manner of Death Determinations - Requirements After Change or Correction (Katherine Morris Death Reclassification Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047 /CH0262 (SB0949)
Title
Consumer Protection – Self–Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0603 (HB0344)
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1047/CH0262)
Title
Consumer Protection - Self-Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0969 /CH0829 Death Certificates - Cause or Manner of Death Determinations - Requirements After Change or Correction (Katherine Morris Death Reclassification Act) Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 829
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 /CH0262 (SB0949) Consumer Protection – Self–Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1310 Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0603 (HB0344) Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1047/CH0262) Consumer Protection - Self-Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page