Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Medical Examiners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 (SB0570)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0788
Title
Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0122
Title
State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0737)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0737 (SB0570) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0934 /CH0788 Public Health – Chief Medical Examiner – Autopsy Findings and Conclusions Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0125 /CH0122 State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0247 /CH0123 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0570 (HB0737) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements President 3 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page