Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0098)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0746)
Title
Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0724)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0809)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0910)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0155)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB1009)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB0894)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1188)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1312)
Title
COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 /CH0522
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0155 (SB0098) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0496 Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0894 (SB0746) Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1009 (SB0724) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1089 Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1188 (SB0809) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1233 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1312 (SB0910) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
SB0098 (HB0155) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0724 (HB1009) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0746 (HB0894) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0809 (HB1188) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1312) COVID-19 Eviction and Housing Relief Act of 2021 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0914 /CH0522 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page