Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007
Title
Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0585)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 (SB0769)
Title
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0455)
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB1017)
Title
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 Venison Donation Expenses - Income Tax Credit and Grant Program Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0585) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1017 (SB0769) Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0585 (HB0455) Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0769 (HB1017) Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page