Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444 /CH0228
Title
Prince George's County Planning Board - Nontraditional Recreational Opportunities - Establishment and Fund MC/PG 104-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464
Title
Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Prince George’s County – Concrete Batching Plants – Setback Requirement MC/PG 106–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0725)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1247)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0444 /CH0228 Prince George's County Planning Board - Nontraditional Recreational Opportunities - Establishment and Fund MC/PG 104-21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0464 Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Mandatory Referral Review MC/PG 101–21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission – Prince George’s County – Concrete Batching Plants – Setback Requirement MC/PG 106–21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0516 Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1247 (SB0725) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0725 (HB1247) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page