Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Maryland Longitudinal Data System

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 /CH0063 (SB0444/CH0064)
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0064 (HB0634/CH0063)
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Student Information - United States Census Bureau
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017
Title
Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0634 /CH0063 (SB0444/CH0064) Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0444 /CH0064 (HB0634/CH0063) Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Student Information - United States Census Bureau Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0756 Primary and Secondary Education - School Safety and Student Well-Being - Examination of Policies and Funding Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1017 Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Formerly Incarcerated Individuals Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page