Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 /CH0540 (SB0377)
Title
Marriage Records – Name Change
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0467
Title
Baltimore County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 /CH0299 (SB0649/CH0300)
Title
Frederick County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 /CH0739 (SB0666)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Out-of-State Licensing Reciprocity - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0369/CH0540)
Title
Marriage Records - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 /CH0300 (HB0452/CH0299)
Title
Frederick County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0369 /CH0540 (SB0377) Marriage Records – Name Change Delegate Belcastro 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0446 /CH0467 Baltimore County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Delegate Forbes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 /CH0299 (SB0649/CH0300) Frederick County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0850 /CH0739 (SB0666) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0902 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Out-of-State Licensing Reciprocity - Study Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0054 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB0369/CH0540) Marriage Records - Name Change Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-27)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0649 /CH0300 (HB0452/CH0299) Frederick County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page