Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0098)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0173)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0372 (SB0488/CH0373)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0155)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0242)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289
Title
Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 /CH0373 (HB0449/CH0372)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 (SB0098) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0242 (SB0173) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0268 Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0449 /CH0372 (SB0488/CH0373) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0930 Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1203 Certificates of Birth and Marriage Certificates - Issuance of New Certificates - Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0098 (HB0155) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0173 (HB0242) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 Anne Arundel County – Marriage License Applications and Ceremonies Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 /CH0373 (HB0449/CH0372) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page