Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0062)
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0047 (SB0816/CH0048)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Payments and Transfer and Zone Intensification Requests PG 416-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 (SB0674)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293 /CH0080 (SB0783/CH0081)
Title
Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0542)
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB1207)
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 /CH0081 (HB1293/CH0080)
Title
Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0073
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 /CH0048 (HB0908/CH0047)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0399 Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0542 (SB0062) Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0908 /CH0047 (SB0816/CH0048) Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments Delegate Carey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Economic Matters
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0980 Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Payments and Transfer and Zone Intensification Requests PG 416-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 (SB0674) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1293 /CH0080 (SB0783/CH0081) Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0062 (HB0542) Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0674 (HB1207) Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0783 /CH0081 (HB1293/CH0080) Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0811 /CH0073 Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/07/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0816 /CH0048 (HB0908/CH0047) Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments Senator Klausmeier 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/20/2021 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page