Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Manslaughter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0626)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 /CH0369 (SB0046)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0231/CH0369)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 (SB0626) Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0231 /CH0369 (SB0046) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1029 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1164 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0046 (HB0231/CH0369) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page