Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0682 (SB0503)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Doula Services – Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0682)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0689)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0684 (SB0787)
Title
Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312)
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0669/CH0682)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 (HB0746)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0755)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0970/CH0684)
Title
Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis for Victims of Sexual Offenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311)
Title
Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0669 /CH0682 (SB0503) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Doula Services – Coverage Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0746 (SB0682) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022) Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0755 (SB0689) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0970 /CH0684 (SB0787) Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis - Prohibition Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1007 Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312) Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0282 Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0503 (HB0669/CH0682) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 (HB0746) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Gender-Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022) Senator Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0689 (HB0755) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prohibited Actions Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0970/CH0684) Managed Care Organizations and Health Insurance Carriers - Prior Authorization for HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis for Victims of Sexual Offenses - Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311) Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page