Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132
Title
Sports Wagering Campaign Contributions Parity Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0878)
Title
Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0628
Title
Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
State Lottery – Internet Sales Authorization and Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
Gaming - Study on Video Lottery Terminals at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0410
Title
Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB1029)
Title
Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 /CH1016
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing Fees
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012
Title
Veterans Affairs – Disabled Veterans Guaranteed Basic Income
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB0764/CH0483)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 Sports Wagering Campaign Contributions Parity Act of 2024 Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116) State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0878) Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0628 Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1218 State Lottery – Internet Sales Authorization and Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1252 Gaming - Study on Video Lottery Terminals at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1524 /CH0410 Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0878 (HB1029) Gaming – Problem Gambling – Prevalence Study and Fund Revenue Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0895 /CH1016 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensing Fees Senator Carter 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1016
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 Veterans Affairs – Disabled Veterans Guaranteed Basic Income Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB1013 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' and Fraternal Organizations Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 (HB0764/CH0483) State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page