Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 (SB0245)
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491)
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 /CH0661
Title
State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0155)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 (SB0796)
Title
Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Property Taxes - Exemption - Dwellings of Senior Citizens
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0015
Title
Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB1257)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 (HB0256)
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0491 (HB0386/CH0490)
Title
Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 (HB1315)
Title
Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 (SB0245) Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0490 (SB0310/CH0491) Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1179 /CH0661 State Lottery - Sales of Lottery Tickets and Tickets From Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Commissions Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 (SB0155) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 (SB0796) Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1361 Property Taxes - Exemption - Dwellings of Senior Citizens Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 /CH0015 Maggie McIntosh School Arts Fund - Established Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Appropriations
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 (HB1257) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0245 (HB0256) Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0491 (HB0386/CH0490) Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0796 (HB1315) Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page