Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lottery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0558)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0299 (SB0660/CH0300)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0818)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 /CH0300 (HB0937/CH0299)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0371 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0553 State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0818 (SB0558) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0937 /CH0299 (SB0660/CH0300) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0558 (HB0818) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0660 /CH0300 (HB0937/CH0299) State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page