Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0155)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 (SB0796)
Title
Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Gaming - Skills-Based Gaming Devices - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB1257)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257)
Title
Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 (HB1315)
Title
Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1257 (SB0155) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 (SB0796) Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1394 Gaming - Skills-Based Gaming Devices - Authorization Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0155 (HB1257) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257) Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0796 (HB1315) Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations - Repeal of the Pre-Printed Ticket Requirement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2022 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page