Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0086)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0631)
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0785 (SB0613/CH0786)
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0813)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Access to Telephones
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 (HB0218)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 /CH0786 (HB0874/CH0785)
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 (HB0349)
Title
Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1253)
Title
Health Care Facilities – Access to Telephones
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0218 (SB0086) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0349 (SB0631) Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0874 /CH0785 (SB0613/CH0786) State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1253 (SB0813) Health Care Facilities - Access to Telephones Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 (HB0218) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2024) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0613 /CH0786 (HB0874/CH0785) State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 (HB0349) Department of Aging - Long-Term Care Insurance - Study Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0813 (HB1253) Health Care Facilities – Access to Telephones Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page