Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0485 (SB0652/CH0486)
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0486 (HB0599/CH0485)
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0303 Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0599 /CH0485 (SB0652/CH0486) Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 485
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1377 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0120 /CH0104 Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0411 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 /CH0486 (HB0599/CH0485) Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page