Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0462 (HB0854/CH0461)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0344 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Contributions (Prohibiting Pay to Play Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0698 /CH0462 (HB0854/CH0461) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page