Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0715)
Title
Student Service Hours - Financial Literacy Course
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415 (SB0378)
Title
State Library Agency - Family Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0429)
Title
Excellence in Maryland Public Schools Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Information Technology - Modernizing Data Governance - Office of Enterprise Data and Council for Open Data Advancement
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391 (SB0906)
Title
Education - Artificial Intelligence - Guidelines and Professional Development
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 (HB0415)
Title
State Library Agency - Family Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0504)
Title
Excellence in Maryland Public Schools Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0326)
Title
Student Service Hours - Financial Literacy Course
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 (HB1391)
Title
Education - Artificial Intelligence - Guidelines, Professional Development, and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0326 (SB0715) Student Service Hours - Financial Literacy Course Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0415 (SB0378) State Library Agency - Family Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0504 (SB0429) Excellence in Maryland Public Schools Act Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0807 Information Technology - Modernizing Data Governance - Office of Enterprise Data and Council for Open Data Advancement Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 (SB0906) Education - Artificial Intelligence - Guidelines and Professional Development Delegate Young 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0378 (HB0415) State Library Agency - Family Literacy Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0429 (HB0504) Excellence in Maryland Public Schools Act President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0715 (HB0326) Student Service Hours - Financial Literacy Course Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2025 - 9:00 AM
SB0906 (HB1391) Education - Artificial Intelligence - Guidelines, Professional Development, and Task Force Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2025 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page