Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447)
Title
Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497)
Title
Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827
Title
Education - Public Schools - Instruction in Print and Cursive Handwriting
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB0699)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108
Title
Charles County Public Library – Imagination Library Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446)
Title
Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB1437)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0200 Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0383 /CH0446 (SB0438/CH0447) Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497) Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 Education - Public Schools - Instruction in Print and Cursive Handwriting Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum Delegate Walker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1437 (SB0699) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0108 Charles County Public Library – Imagination Library Program – Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0447 (HB0383/CH0446) Young Readers Programs - Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 (HB1437) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:10 PM
Click to return on the top page