Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0126)
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0237)
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0486 (HB0599/CH0485)
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0237 (SB0126) State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0850 Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Appropriations
3/15/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0126 (HB0237) State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0652 /CH0486 (HB0599/CH0485) Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2021 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page