Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 /CH0627 (SB0634/CH0626)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826 (SB0779)
Title
Real Property – Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short–Term Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0784)
Title
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0766)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0600 (SB1028/CH0599)
Title
Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 (SB1005)
Title
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0626 (HB0776/CH0627)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1007)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB0935)
Title
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB1427)
Title
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600)
Title
Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828) Insurance - Hearing Representation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0271 Limited Liability Companies - Articles of Organization - Required Information Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0776 /CH0627 (SB0634/CH0626) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0826 (SB0779) Real Property – Taxation of Vacant Property, Certification of Company Representatives, and Short–Term Rentals Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0935 (SB0784) Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 (SB0766) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Montgomery County and Prince George’s County – Enforcement of Local Vacant Property Laws Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1168 /CH0600 (SB1028/CH0599) Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act) Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1314 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Public Information Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 (SB1005) Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Ways and Means
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0085 Corporations and Associations - Limited Worker Cooperative Associations - Authorization (Maryland Limited Cooperative Association Act) Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827) Insurance - Hearing Representation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 828
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0634 /CH0626 (HB0776/CH0627) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1007) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB0935) Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB1427) Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600) Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page