Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 (SB0561)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0403)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0403 (SB0561) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 (HB0403) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page